3 Deepak BoraNewbie Asked: June 30, 20202020-06-30T09:21:20+05:30 2020-06-30T09:21:20+05:30In: ICSE, Logical Reasoning Please solve this trick question for me 3 If 12 x 12 = 9, and 23 x 23 = 16. Then what is 34 x 34 =? If possible tell me the approach of solving this Mathematics trick question. reasoningtrick question Share Facebook 2 Answers Voted Oldest Recent Deepak Bora Newbie 2020-07-01T05:03:48+05:30Added an answer on July 1, 2020 at 5:03 am 12 x 12 = 9 (12 x 12 = 144 and adding all the digits 1+4+4= 9) and 23 x 23 = 16 (23 x 23 = 529 and adding all the digits 5+2+9= 16) similarly 34 x 34 =13 (34 x 34 =1156 and add all the digits 1+1+5+6= 13) 3 Reply Share Share Share on Facebook Share on Twitter Share on LinkedIn Share on WhatsApp Deepak Bora Newbie 2020-07-01T20:34:29+05:30Added an answer on July 1, 2020 at 8:34 pm Thank you Deepak Sir for answering this mathematics trick question. I will ask here more if I have a doubt. 0 Reply Share Share Share on Facebook Share on Twitter Share on LinkedIn Share on WhatsApp Leave an answerLeave an answerCancel reply Featured image Select file Browse Add a Video to describe the problem better. Video type Youtube Vimeo Dailymotion Facebook Choose from here the video type. Video ID Put Video ID here: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=sdUUx5FdySs Ex: "sdUUx5FdySs". Click on image to update the captcha. Save my name, email, and website in this browser for the next time I comment. Related Questions Point P(5,−3) is one of the two points of trisection of the line segment joining the points A(7,−2) ... In triangle ABC, D and E are mid-points of the sides BC and AC respectively. Find the length ... Find the area of the quadrilateral ABCD, whose vertices are A(1,0),B(5,3),C(2,7) and D(−2,4). How do I get online coaching for an international school entrance exam? Will boarding schools be safe for students after the end of this COVID-19 global epidemic?

12 x 12 = 9 (12 x 12 = 144 and adding all the digits 1+4+4= 9)

and

23 x 23 = 16 (23 x 23 = 529 and adding all the digits 5+2+9= 16)

similarly

34 x 34 =13 (34 x 34 =1156 and add all the digits 1+1+5+6= 13)

Thank you Deepak Sir for answering this mathematics trick question. I will ask here more if I have a doubt.